McARTHUR MARSHALL E.
Storm Lake
Born May 16, 1899. Enl. October 12, 1918. Pvt. Co. F, 2d Bn. Aviation
Section, S. A. T. C. Trained at University of Chicago. Mustered out
December 12, 1918. (no photo)
|
McBRIDE, FRANK
Coon Township
Born October 16, 1892. Enl. July 24, 1918. Pvt. Co. G, 316th Inf. 79th
Div. Trained at Camp Gordon until August 26, 1918. Sailed from Hoboken
on U. S. S. Plattsburg, September 1; landed Brest September 13, 1918.
To St. Georges until September 30; to Verdun sector, stationed at
Issencourt until October 25; to Meuse sector of Verdun front October 28;
in offensive from October 28 to November 11; wounded by high-explosive
shell in right jaw and right leg November 3, 1918; to hosp. at Verdun
and then to Portiers from November 6 until January 18, 1919; returned to
co. at Issencourt; to Heipps and hiked to Trampot; to Vallet April 1; to
St. Nazaire. Sailed May 16 on U. S. S. Texan; landed Philadelphia May
29. To Camp Dix; to Camp Dodge. Mustered out June 8, 1919.
|
McCONKEY HOMER B.
Scott Township
Born February 4, 1895. Enl. June 4, 1917. Pvt. with Med. Dept. 109th
Engrs. 34th Div. Trained at Camp Dodge one year; to Camp Dix. Sailed
from New York September 17, on Cretic; landed Liverpool October 1. To
Winchester; crossed Channel to Cherbourg. To Mesves; to Bulcy four
months; to St. Amiens three and one-half months; to Le Mans one month;
to Precigne two weeks; to St. Nazaire. Sailed on June 17 on Pastoria;
landed New York June 26. To Camp Mills; to Camp Dodge. Mustered out
July 2, 1919. (no photo)
|
MCCULLOUGH, GEORGE K.
Storm Lake
Born June 26, 1882. Enl. May 14, 1917. Major Maintenance and
Reconstruction of Trenches, and Supervision of Railroad Building and
Highway Improvement. Commissioned 1st Lieut, after training at Ft.
Snelling; to Ft. Leavenworth until August 27; to Camp Dodge where he was
with Co. B, 313th Engrs. 88th Div. Promoted to Captain August 15.
1917. Temporary Division Ordnance Officer at Camp Dodge until September
22, 1917; promoted to rank of Major February 25, 1919, while in France.
August 5, 1918, to Camp Mills. Sailed from New York on British ship
Plassy; landed Liverpool August 28. To Knotty Ash; to Southampton;
crossed Channel on U. S. S. Yale; landed Le Havre September 2. To Les
Laumes; to Cote d'Or; to Hericourt with 1st Bn. of which Co. B was a
part; ordered to Chavanne, arrived September 19; to Elbach, Alsace,
October 7, to be in charge of maintenance and reconstruction of trenches
of 350th Inf.; at Pagne-de-Barrine when armistice was signed; after
armistice co. rebuilt railroad from Paris to Metz, later engaged on
highway work. Sailed from St. Nazaire May 25 on U. S. S. Madawska;
landed New York June 6. To Camp Dodge. Mustered out after 26 months of
service, July 2, 1919.
|
McDANEL, ARCHIE W.
Barnes Township
Born March 9, 1892. Enl. July 29, 1918. Pvt. 1st-cl. Co. B, 214th
Engrs. 14th Div. Trained at Camp Forrest; Camp Custer. Mustered out
February 7, 1919.
|
McFARLINE, LEE HOWARD
Newell
Born April 15, 1894. Enl. June 10, 1918. Landsman machinist's mate,
1st-cl. Co, H, 15th Rest. Trained at G. L. N. T. S., at main station.
Mustered out January 17, 1919.
|
McGARRY, JAMES P.
Scott Township
Born April 22, 1897. Enl. September 5, 1918. Pvt. Co. F, 88th Inf.
19th Div. Trained at Camp Dodge. Mustered out March 26, 1919.
|
McGINN, GEORGE WILLIAM
Storm Lake
Born August 24, 1893. Enl. July 24, 1918. Pvt. 1st-cl. Co. D, 4th
Replm. Regt. Trained at Camp Gordon. Mustered out January 28, 1919.
|
McGREEVY, ARCHIBALD F.
Sioux Rapids
Born September 17, 1885. Enl. July 8, 1917. 2d Lieut. Vet. Corps at
Camp Greeleaf; Depot Quarter Master, Chicago. Called into service from
Marathon; reported for duty at Camp Greenleaf - this was a large
training camp for Veterinary, Dental and Medical Officers; the course
was 90 days, but the need for officers in Vet. Corps was so urgent that
all men with any previous experience were picked and put through in 60
days. Having been a member of the N. G. and also experienced as a
veterinarian with 1st Illinois Art. in 1916, he was ordered to the Depot
Quarter at Chicago, on duty there as inspector and drill instructor for
60 days; to Camp Lewis as Asst. Camp Vet. Meat and Dairy Insp. Mustered
out July 21, 1919.
|
McKEE, HAROLD E.
Storm Lake
Born March 2, 1900. Enl. July 22, 1918. Fireman 1st-cl. on U. S. S.
Supply. Trained at G. L. N. T. S., Ft. Monroe, and on U. S. S. Supply.
(no photo)
|
McKEE, JOHN C.
Storm Lake
Born September 29, 1891. Enl. May 9, 1918. Corp. Co. F, Ordnance Supply
School. Trained at Jefferson Barracks; to Camp Hancock; to Camp
Merritt. Sailed with 7th H. M. O. R. S. October 4; landed Brest October
15. Trained at Angouleme and Souhesmes with the 1st Army. Sailed from
St. Nazaire January 10 on Manchuria; landed Hoboken. To Camp Merritt;
to Camp Dix; to Camp Grant. Mustered out February 11, 1919. (no photo)
|
McKEE, MARY L.
Storm Lake
Born May 3, 1893. Enl. July 17, 1918. Signal Service under civil
service at Washington, D. C. Mustered out December 20, 1918. (no
photo)
|
McKENNA, LAWRENCE EDWARD
Providence Township
Born September 11, 1897. Enl. August 7, 1918. Pvt. Co. D, 9th Separate
Bn. U. S. Marines. Trained at Paris Island. Sailed from New York on
the Henderson; landed Brest November 1. To Tours; to St. Nazaire for
guard duty until June, 1919. Sailed on U. S. S. Roanoke; landed
Charleston. Mustered out June 21, 1919.
|
McKENNA, NEIL
Storm Lake
Born March 28, 1893. Enl. December 14, 1917. Machinist 1st-cl.
Squadron 6; also Aerial Gunner. Trained at U. S. N. Training Station;
G. L. N. T. S.; and Naval Air Station. Mustered out March 29, 1919.
|
McPHERSON, CLARENCE
Storm Lake
Born March 12, 1893. Enl. July 24, 1918. Pvt. Camp Hdqrs., Camp
Gordon. Trained at Camp Gordon.
|
McRAE, ROYDEN C.
Providence Township
Born June 28, 1886. Enl. May 7, 1918. Machine Gunner, Co. A, 303d Bn.
304th Brigade Tank Corps. Trained at Camp Worgret; Wareham; Dorset -
all in England. Sailed from New York August 14; landed Liverpool August
28. Two months in training camps in England; crossed Channel October 31
to Le Havre. To reserve lines November 4; trained at Langres and
Haute-Marne. Promoted to pvt. 1st-cl. Training consisted in machine
gunnery, six pounders, tank driving, and regular infantry drill. Sailed
for Hoboken from Marseilles by way of Gibraltar March 22, 1919.
Mustered out April 7, 1919.
|
MacRUNNELS, RALPH A.
Storm Lake
Enl. May 20, 1918. Sailed overseas June 30 with A. E. F. with Engrs. in
France; in Russia with Engrs. from April 17, 1919, to July 28, 1919.
Landed U. S. August 17, 1919. (no photo)
1Eilers,
Tom D.
Buena
Vista's Part in the World War.
Storm Lake, 1920, pp. 160-62. |
Contributed Anonymously |